WY HB0002 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to school buildings and facilities; requiring a study on the suitability, capacity and condition of school buildings and facilities; authorizing contracting with a consultant; requiring reporting; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
School buildings and facilities study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-28 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | COW:H Did not consider for COW |
2021-01-28 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-01-28 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2021-01-27 | House | :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2021-01-27 | House | H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2021-01-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-12-11 | Bill Number Assigned |