WY HB0001 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 80
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to supplemental appropriations for the operation of state government; increasing or decreasing certain amounts; adjusting the number of positions; modifying prior appropriations; making additional appropriations; requiring reports; making certain appropriations subject to the terms and conditions specified; amending existing law by redirecting revenues for the remainder of the current biennium and the period of the budget; amending a task force; providing for matching funds programs; requiring deposit of funds upon the sale or demolition of certain school facilities as specified; providing transfers of certain funds as specified; creating a task force; directing amendments to the Medicaid state plan; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General government appropriations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Senate - Did Not Override Line Item Veto 14-15-1-0-0 (Y: 14 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Did Not Override Line Item Veto 14-15-1-0-0 (Y: 14 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Line Item Veto Override 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Line Item Veto Override 23-5-2-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - Line Item Veto Override 43-16-1-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - Line Item Veto Override 52-7-1-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - Line Item Veto Override 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - Line Item Veto Override 44-15-1-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Adopted HB0001JC001: 45-14-1-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Adopted HB0001JC001: 18-11-1-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Amendment adopted 40-16-4-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Amendment adopted 31-25-4-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Amendment adopted 35-21-4-0-0 (Y: 35 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Amendment adopted 50-6-4-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Amendment adopted 41-15-4-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Amendment adopted 36-20-4-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Amendment adopted 41-12-4-0-3 (Y: 41 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Amendment adopted 53-3-4-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Amendment adopted 30-26-4-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Amendment adopted 52-4-4-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Amendment failed 27-29-4-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - House - Amendment adopted 34-22-4-0-0 (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Amendment adopted 48-8-4-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Amendment adopted 36-20-4-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-15-4-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - Amendment adopted 46-10-3-0-1 (Y: 46 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - Amendment adopted 51-6-3-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - Amendment adopted 39-18-3-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - Amendment adopted 48-9-3-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - Amendment adopted 55-2-3-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - Amendment adopted 44-14-2-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - Amendment failed 27-31-2-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-01-29 - House - Amendment adopted 32-25-3-0-0 (Y: 32 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - Amendment adopted 42-16-2-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - Amendment adopted 52-6-2-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26 Assigned Chapter Number 80
2019-02-26 Veto Message Received
2019-02-20SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0051
2019-02-20HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0051
2019-02-19 Assigned Number HEA No. 0051
2019-02-08SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2019-02-08HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2019-02-08SenateSenate:Pursuant to JR 14-1 (g) referred directly to JCC
2019-02-08SenateSenate:Pursuant to JR 14-1 (f) referred directly to 3rd Reading
2019-02-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to S02
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations
2019-02-01SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-31House3rd Reading:Passed 41-15-4-0-0
2019-01-29House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-28HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-28HouseIntroduced and Referred to HCOW
2019-01-28HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-25 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2019/Introduced/HB0001.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2019/Enroll/HB0001.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2019/Fiscal/HB0001.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#5174
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#5130
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#5129
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#5131
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#5132
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#5133
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#5134
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#5135
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#5136
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#5137
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#5138
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#5160
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#5161
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#5162
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#5163
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#5164
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#5165
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#5166
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#5167
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#5168
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#5169
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#5170
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#5171
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#5172
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#5173
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#488
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#5369
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#5494
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#5495
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#5496
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#5497
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#639
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#640
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#641
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0001#642

Bill Comments

feedback