WV SR6 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on February 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on February 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adopting special rule of order relating to proxy voting due to COVID-19 pandemic
Title
Adopting special rule of order relating to proxy voting due to COVID-19 pandemic
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Trump [R] | Sen. Mike Woelfel [D] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. Stephen Baldwin [D] |
Sen. Richard Lindsay [D] | Sen. Glenn Jeffries [D] | Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2021-02-12 | Senate | To Rules |
2021-02-12 | Senate | To Rules |
2021-02-12 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |