WV SR4 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging US Army Corps of Engineers study clean energy production at Summersville dam
Title
Urging US Army Corps of Engineers study clean energy production at Summersville dam
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2022-01-13 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2022-01-13 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2022-01-13 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |