WV SR37 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing sister-state relationship between WV and Taiwan
Title
Recognizing sister-state relationship between WV and Taiwan
Sponsors
Sen. Craig Blair [R] | Sen. Ryan Weld [R] | Sen. Jason Barrett [R] | Sen. Patricia Rucker [R] |
Sen. Robert Karnes [R] | Sen. Michael Maroney [R] | Sen. Mike Stuart [R] | Sen. Eric Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-28 - Senate - Adopted (Roll No. 308) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Adopted (Roll No. 308) |
2023-02-28 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2023-02-22 | Senate | To Rules |
2023-02-22 | Senate | To Rules |
2023-02-22 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |