WV SR24 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-10 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-10 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Opposing US Supreme Court's interpretation of Constitution in Citizens United v. Federal Election Commission
Title
Requesting Congress propose constitutional amendment overturning Citizens United v. Federal Election Commission ruling
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-10 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Deferred until reconvening after recess |
2013-04-10 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2013-03-06 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-03-06 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |