WV SR16 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amending Senate Rule 14 relating to introduction of concurrent resolutions
Title
Amending Senate Rule 14 relating to introduction of concurrent resolutions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2021-03-09 | Senate | To Rules |
2021-03-09 | Senate | To Rules |
2021-03-09 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |