WV SJR9 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SJR9

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Rejected by Senate (Roll No. 266)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amendment Authorizing Legislature to Eliminate or Lower Ad Valorem Tax on Motor Vehicles and Any Other Tangible Personal Property

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle and Other Personal Property Tax Reduction Amendment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - Senate - Rejected by Senate (Roll No. 266) (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Floor amendments rejected (Roll No. 222) (Y: 15 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25SenateRejected by Senate (Roll No. 266)
2020-02-25SenateRead 3rd time
2020-02-24SenateLaid over on 3rd reading 2/24/20
2020-02-24SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-02-21SenateFloor amendments rejected (Roll No. 222)
2020-02-21SenateRead 2nd time
2020-02-21SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-02-20SenateRead 1st time
2020-02-20SenateOn 1st reading
2020-02-19SenateReported be adopted
2020-02-03SenateTo Finance
2020-02-03SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Finance
2020-01-21SenateTo Judiciary
2020-01-21SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-01-21SenateTo Judiciary then Finance
2020-01-21SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SJR9 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - To Judiciary

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback