WV SJR11 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-10 - On 3rd reading with right to amend, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-10 - On 3rd reading with right to amend, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional Officer Term Limit Amendment
Title
Constitutional Officer Term Limit Amendment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - House - Motion to place on special calendar tabled (Roll No. 602) (Y: 75 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-27 - Senate - Adopted by Senate (Roll No. 225) (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-27 - Senate - Adopted by Senate (Roll No. 225) (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-10 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, House Calendar |
2021-04-10 | House | Motion to place on special calendar tabled (Roll No. 602) |
2021-04-10 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, House Calendar |
2021-04-09 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2021-04-09 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Amendment pending |
2021-04-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-08 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-07 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-04-07 | House | Immediate consideration |
2021-04-07 | House | With amendment, be adopted |
2021-03-29 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-03-29 | House | To Judiciary |
2021-03-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Roll No. 225) |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2021-03-16 | Senate | To Finance |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2021-03-02 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-02 | Senate | To Judiciary then Finance |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HJR21 (Similar To) 2021-02-23 - To House Government Organization
HJR21 (Similar To) 2021-02-23 - To House Government Organization
HJR21 (Similar To) 2021-02-23 - To House Government Organization