WV SJR1 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR1
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this resolution is to amend the State Constitution to prohibit the state, counties, municipalities, or other political subdivisions of the state from restricting the right to keep and bear arms.
Title
Protection of the Right to Bear Arms Amendment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Adopted by Senate (Roll No. 280) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-04-01 | House | To Judiciary |
2021-04-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Title amendment adopted |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Roll No. 280) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-30 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-03-29 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2021-03-24 | Senate | To Finance |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2021-02-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-10 | Senate | To Judiciary then Finance |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SJR1 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - To House Judiciary