WV SCR8 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Fire Chief Kenneth Junior Russell Memorial Bridge
Title
Fire Chief Kenneth Junior Russell Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Takubo [R] | Sen. Rupert Phillips [R] | Sen. John Unger [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] |
Sen. Mark Maynard [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-03-29 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-03-29 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-29 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2021-03-29 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2021-03-29 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2021-03-26 | House | Be adopted |
2021-03-25 | House | To House Rules |
2021-03-25 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2021-03-25 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2021-03-25 | House | Recommitted to the committee on Technology and Infrastructure |
2021-03-25 | House | To House Rules |
2021-03-25 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2021-03-05 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2021-03-05 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Rules |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2021-02-24 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2021-02-24 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2021-02-24 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |