WV SCR7 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - To House Technology and Infrastructure
Pending: House Technology and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Urging Congress provide exceptions to weight limits on trucks on interstate

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging Congress provide exceptions to weight limits on interstate

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15HouseTo House Technology and Infrastructure
2019-02-15HouseTo Technology and Infrastructure then Rules
2019-02-15HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-14SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-14SenateAdopted by Senate (Voice vote)
2019-02-14SenateOn Unfinished Business
2019-02-13SenateCommittee substitute reported
2019-01-14SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2019-01-14SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2019-01-14SenateOn Unfinished Business
2019-01-11SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-11SenateFiled for introduction

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback