WV SCR6 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
US Navy Seaman 2nd Class Wilbur 'Webb' Hahn and John W. Hahn Memorial Bridge
Title
US Navy Seaman 2nd Class Wilbur 'Webb' Hahn and John W. Hahn Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] | Sen. Rupert Phillips [R] | Sen. John Unger [D] | Sen. Randy Smith [R] |
Sen. Glenn Jeffries [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-03-29 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-03-29 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-29 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2021-03-29 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2021-03-29 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2021-03-26 | House | Be adopted |
2021-03-25 | House | To House Rules |
2021-03-25 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2021-03-25 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2021-03-25 | House | Recommitted to the committee on Technology and Infrastructure |
2021-03-25 | House | To House Rules |
2021-03-25 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2021-02-26 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2021-02-26 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Rules |
2021-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2021-02-19 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2021-02-19 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2021-02-19 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |