WV SCR6 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-23 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-23 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supporting construction of Gold Star Families Memorial Monument
Title
Supporting construction of Gold Star Families Memorial Monument
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Ferns [R] | Sen. Mitch Carmichael [R] | Sen. Ryan Weld [R] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] |
Sen. Robert Beach [D] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. Gregory Boso [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-23 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-01-22 | House | Completed legislative action |
2018-01-22 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-01-22 | House | Adopted by House (Voice vote) |
2018-01-22 | House | Reference dispensed |
2018-01-22 | House | Immediate consideration |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2018-01-18 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |