WV SCR55 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-6)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-6)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supporting Atlantic Coast Pipeline
Title
Supporting Atlantic Coast Pipeline
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-04-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-04-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-09 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2021-04-09 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Be adopted |
2021-04-07 | House | To House Rules |
2021-04-07 | House | To Rules |
2021-04-07 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2021-03-27 | Senate | To Energy, Industry, and Mining |
2021-03-27 | Senate | To Energy, Industry, and Mining |
2021-03-27 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |