WV SCR5 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress call Article V convention to impose fiscal restraints on federal government
Title
Urging Congress call Article V convention to impose fiscal restraints on federal government
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Karnes [R] | Sen. Amy Nichole Grady [R] | Sen. Patricia Rucker [R] | Sen. Patrick Martin [R] |
Sen. Mike Azinger [R] | Sen. Rupert Phillips [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-03-25 | House | To Judiciary then Rules |
2021-03-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2021-02-19 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-02-19 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-02-19 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |