WV SCR46 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - To House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - To House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Stanley W. and Evelyn C. See Memorial Bridge
Title
Stanley W. and Evelyn C. See Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] | Sen. Glenn Jeffries [D] | Sen. Randy Smith [R] | Sen. Richard Lindsay [D] |
Sen. John Unger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | To House Rules |
2021-04-01 | House | To Rules |
2021-04-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2021-03-23 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2021-03-23 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2021-03-23 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |