WV SCR45 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-05 - To House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-05 - To House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Dennis E. Davis Veterans Nursing Home
Title
Dennis E. Davis Veterans Nursing Home
Sponsors
Sen. Rollan Roberts [R] | Sen. Glenn Jeffries [D] | Sen. Stephen Baldwin [D] | Sen. Richard Lindsay [D] |
Sen. John Unger [D] | Sen. Ryan Weld [R] | Sen. Michael Caputo [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - Senate - Adopted by Senate (Roll No. 302) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | House | To House Rules |
2021-04-05 | House | To Rules |
2021-04-05 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Roll No. 302) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2021-03-23 | Senate | To Military |
2021-03-23 | Senate | To Military |
2021-03-23 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |