WV SCR41 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Ordered to House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting study creating paid family and medical leave insurance program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting study creating paid family and medical leave insurance program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-09SenateOrdered to House
2019-03-09SenateAdopted by Senate (Voice vote)
2019-03-09SenateImmediate consideration
2019-03-09SenateReported be adopted
2019-03-05SenateTo Rules
2019-03-05SenateReported be adopted, but first to Rules
2019-02-20SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2019-02-20SenateTo Health and Human Resources then Rules
2019-02-20SenateOn Unfinished Business
2019-02-19SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-02-19SenateFiled for introduction

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback