WV SCR39 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-02 - To House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-02 - To House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Birthplace of Alabama Coach Nick Saban
Title
Home of Nick Saban
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-02 | House | To House Rules |
2021-04-02 | House | To Rules |
2021-04-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2021-03-22 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2021-03-22 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2021-03-22 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |