WV SCR39 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-08 - To House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-08 - To House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting creation of Joint Select Committee on Requirements Governing Water Quality Standards
Title
Requesting creation of Joint Select Committee on Requirements Governing Water Quality Standards
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Trump [R] | Sen. Stephen Baldwin [D] | Sen. Chandler Swope [R] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] |
Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. William Ihlenfeld [D] | Sen. Michael Maroney [R] | Sen. Patricia Rucker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | House | To House Rules |
2019-03-08 | House | With amendment, be adopted, but first to Rules |
2019-03-01 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-03-01 | House | To Judiciary then Rules |
2019-03-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2019-02-20 | Senate | To Rules |
2019-02-20 | Senate | To Rules |
2019-02-20 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |