WV SCR34 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
USMC SGTMAJ Herman H. Brawner Memorial Bridge
Title
USMC SGTMAJ Herman H. Brawner Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Adopted by Senate (Roll No. 219) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-02-28 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-02-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-28 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2022-02-28 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2022-02-28 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2022-02-25 | House | Be adopted |
2022-02-24 | House | To House Rules |
2022-02-24 | House | To Rules |
2022-02-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Roll No. 219) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2022-02-07 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2022-02-07 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2022-02-07 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |