WV SCR33 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting WV Infrastructure and Jobs Development Council study and report on consolidation regarding public water and sewer utilities
Title
Requesting WV Infrastructure and Jobs Development Council study and report on consolidation regarding public water and sewer utilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-09 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2016-03-09 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2016-03-09 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2016-03-08 | House | Be adopted |
2016-02-23 | House | To House Rules |
2016-02-23 | House | To Rules |
2016-02-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2016-02-12 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2016-02-12 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2016-02-12 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |