WV SCR31 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

SGT James E. Mattingly Bridge

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SGT James E. Mattingly Bridge

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-09HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-09HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-09HouseAdopted by House (Voice vote)
2019-03-09HouseImmediate consideration
2019-03-09HouseReference dispensed
2019-03-09HouseReported by the Clerk
2019-03-09HouseBe adopted
2019-03-07HouseTo House Rules
2019-03-07HouseTo Rules
2019-03-07HouseIntroduced in House
2019-03-06SenateOrdered to House
2019-03-06SenateAdopted by Senate (Voice vote)
2019-03-06SenateImmediate consideration
2019-03-06SenateReported be adopted
2019-02-14SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2019-02-14SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2019-02-14SenateOn Unfinished Business
2019-02-13SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-02-13SenateFiled for introduction

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback