WV SCR28 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

James Henry Caruthers Memorial Road

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

US Army SP5 James Henry Caruthers Memorial Road

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-09HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-09HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-09HouseAdopted by House (Voice vote)
2019-03-09HouseImmediate consideration
2019-03-09HouseReference dispensed
2019-03-09HouseReported by the Clerk
2019-03-09HouseBe adopted
2019-03-05HouseTo House Rules
2019-03-05HouseWith amendment, be adopted, but first to Rules
2019-03-01HouseTo House Technology and Infrastructure
2019-03-01HouseTo Technology and Infrastructure then Rules
2019-03-01HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-28SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-28SenateAdopted by Senate (Voice vote)
2019-02-28SenateOn Unfinished Business
2019-02-27SenateCommittee substitute reported
2019-02-13SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2019-02-13SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2019-02-13SenateOn Unfinished Business
2019-02-12SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-02-12SenateFiled for introduction

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback