WV SCR27 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-01 - To House Technology and Infrastructure
Pending: House Technology and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting study determining shortage of drivers with CDLs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting study supply or shortage of drivers with CDLs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-01HouseTo House Technology and Infrastructure
2019-03-01HouseTo Technology and Infrastructure then Rules
2019-03-01HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-28SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-28SenateAdopted by Senate (Voice vote)
2019-02-28SenateOn Unfinished Business
2019-02-27SenateCommittee substitute reported
2019-02-12SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2019-02-12SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2019-02-12SenateOn Unfinished Business
2019-02-11SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-02-11SenateFiled for introduction

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback