WV SCR25 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
US Army PFC Andrew "Bo" Martin Harper Memorial Bridge
Title
US Army PFC Andrew "Bo" Martin Harper Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Beach [D] | Sen. Glenn Jeffries [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Stephen Baldwin [D] |
Sen. Corey Palumbo [D] | Sen. Chandler Swope [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2019-03-07 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2019-03-07 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2019-03-06 | House | Be adopted |
2019-03-05 | House | To House Rules |
2019-03-05 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2019-02-19 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2019-02-19 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Rules |
2019-02-19 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-02-06 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2019-02-06 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2019-02-06 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |