WV SCR17 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-06 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-06 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
US Navy HT2 Phillip Joseph "PJ" Hainer Memorial Bridge
Title
US Navy PO2 Phillip Joseph "PJ" Hainer Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-04 | House | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-04 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2023-03-04 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2023-03-04 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2023-03-03 | House | Be adopted |
2023-03-01 | House | To House Rules |
2023-03-01 | House | To Rules |
2023-03-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2023-02-28 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2023-02-20 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2023-02-20 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2023-02-20 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |