WV SCR17 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-07 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-07 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
USMC PFC Manuel P. Markos Memorial Bridge
Title
USMC PFC Manuel P. Markos Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
Sen. William Ihlenfeld [D] | Sen. Robert Beach [D] | Sen. Richard Lindsay [D] | Sen. Michael Romano [D] |
Sen. John Unger [D] | Sen. Ryan Weld [R] | Sen. Glenn Jeffries [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-07 | House | Adopted by House (Voice vote) |
2020-03-07 | House | Immediate consideration |
2020-03-07 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2020-03-07 | House | Be adopted |
2020-02-21 | House | To House Rules |
2020-02-21 | House | To Rules |
2020-02-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2020-02-03 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2020-02-03 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2020-02-03 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |