WV SCR1 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - To House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - To House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designating dogs adopted from animal shelters and rescues as WV official state dog
Title
Designating dogs adopted from animal shelters and rescues as WV official state dog
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | To House Rules |
2020-02-24 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2020-01-15 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2020-01-15 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Rules |
2020-01-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Laid over on Unfinished Business 1/13/20 |
2020-01-13 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |