WV SB94 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 124, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 124, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing persons with physical disabilities ability to vote by electronic absentee ballot
Title
Providing persons with physical disabilities ability to vote by electronic absentee ballot
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-24 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 37) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 36) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 34) (Y: 37 N: 58 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 1) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 36) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 34) (Y: 37 N: 58 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 1) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 124, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-02-04 | House | Approved by Governor 2/3/20 - House Journal |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/3/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/3/20 |
2020-01-29 | House | To Governor 1/28/20 - House Journal |
2020-01-29 | Senate | To Governor 1/28/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-01-28 | Senate | To Governor 1/28/20 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-01-24 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-01-24 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-01-24 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 37) |
2020-01-24 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 36) |
2020-01-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-01-24 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-23 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 34) |
2020-01-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-01-23 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-01-22 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-21 | House | Do pass |
2020-01-16 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-01-16 | House | To Judiciary |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 1) |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-01-15 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-01-14 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-01-13 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 3 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 3 | 1a | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 3 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 3 | 2b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 3 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 3 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 3 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |