WV SB89 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 214, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 214, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide that the salary of the executive director of the West Virginia Prosecuting Attorneys Institute shall be established by the executive council of the institute, with a minimum salary of $70,000.
Title
Relating to compensation for certain public officials
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 4) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 411) (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 411) (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Chapter 214, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 3/18/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/18/15 |
2015-03-16 | House | To Governor 3/16/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-16 | Senate | To Governor 3/16/15 |
2015-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 4) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-10 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 411) |
2015-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-10 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-10 | House | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice) |
2015-03-10 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2015-03-10 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-09 | House | Amendment pending |
2015-03-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-09 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-07 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-03-07 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-06 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2015-02-24 | House | To House Finance |
2015-02-24 | House | To Finance |
2015-02-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-23 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2015-01-14 | Senate | To Finance |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-01-14 | Senate | To Finance |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
6 | 7 | 2a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 4 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |