WV SB88 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 94, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 94, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to claims for total loss and debris removal proceeds under farmers' mutual fire insurance companies
Title
Relating to claims for total loss and debris removal proceeds under farmers' mutual fire insurance companies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-08 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 46) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 373) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 373) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 94, Acts, Regular Session, 2014 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/24/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/21/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-21 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/14 |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 46) |
2014-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-08 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 373) |
2014-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-07 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-03-06 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-05 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2014-02-28 | House | To House Judiciary |
2014-02-28 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2014-02-18 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2014-02-18 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2014-02-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-17 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-14 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-02-13 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2014-02-07 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2014-01-08 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-01-08 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 22 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
38 | 10E | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |