WV SB855 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-07 - On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-07 - On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expiring funds to State Rail Authority, WV Commuter Rail Access Fund from Auditor's Office, Purchasing Card Administration Fund
Title
Expiring funds to State Rail Authority, WV Commuter Rail Access Fund from Auditor's Office, Purchasing Card Administration Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 421) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 421) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 421) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-03-05 | House | Reference dispensed |
2020-03-05 | House | Immediate consideration |
2020-03-05 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 421) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 421) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Originating in Senate Finance |