WV SB854 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-07 - On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Expiring funds to Division of Culture and History from Auditor's Office, Purchasing Card Administration Fund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expiring funds to Division of Culture and History from Auditor's Office, Purchasing Card Administration Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 420) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 420) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-07HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-06HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-03-05HouseRead 1st time
2020-03-05HouseReference dispensed
2020-03-05HouseImmediate consideration
2020-03-05HouseIntroduced in House
2020-03-04SenateOrdered to House
2020-03-04SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 420)
2020-03-04SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 420)
2020-03-04SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-04SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-03-03SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-03SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-03-02SenateRead 1st time
2020-03-02SenateOn 1st reading
2020-02-29SenateReported do pass
2020-02-29SenateOriginating in Senate Finance

Subjects


West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback