WV SB849 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 189, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 189, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to military service as factor in certain insurance coverage rates
Title
Relating to military service as factor in certain insurance coverage rates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 619) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 618) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 389) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 389) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-29 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 434) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 433) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 338) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 338) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 618) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 389) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 389) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-29 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 434) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 433) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 338) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 338) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 189, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/12/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/12/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/12/20 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-05 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 619) |
2020-03-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 618) |
2020-03-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 389) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 389) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-02-29 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-29 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 434) |
2020-02-29 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-02-29 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 433) |
2020-02-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-29 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-28 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-02-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-28 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-27 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-27 | House | Reference dispensed |
2020-02-27 | House | Immediate consideration |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 338) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 338) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Originating in Senate Judiciary |