WV SB848 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 97, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 97, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifying persons charged with DUI may not participate in Military Service Members Court
Title
Clarifying persons charged with DUI may not participate in Military Service Members Court
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 593) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 337) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 337) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 97, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/18/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/18/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/18/20 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-05 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 593) |
2020-03-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-05 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-03 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-03-03 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-02 | House | Do pass |
2020-02-27 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-02-27 | House | To Judiciary |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 337) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Originating in Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 16 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |