WV SB842 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 115, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring Superintendent of Schools establish a Behavior Interventionist Pilot Program in two schoool districts for five years

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring Superintendent of Schools establish a Behavior Interventionist Pilot Program in two school districts for five years

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-06 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 698) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 697) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 473) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 473) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 543) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 542) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 541) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 334) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 334) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-14SenateChapter 115, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
2020-03-07HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-25SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/20
2020-03-07HouseTo Governor 3/18/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateTo Governor 3/18/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-18SenateTo Governor 3/18/20
2020-03-07SenateHouse Message received
2020-03-06HouseCompleted legislative action
2020-03-06HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-06HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 698)
2020-03-06HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 697)
2020-03-06HouseHouse received Senate message
2020-03-05SenateSenate requests House to concur
2020-03-05SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 473)
2020-03-05SenateSenate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 473)
2020-03-05SenateHouse Message received
2020-03-04HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-04HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 543)
2020-03-04HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-04HousePassed House (Roll No. 542)
2020-03-04HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-04HouseDispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 541)
2020-03-04HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-04HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-04HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-03-03HouseRead 1st time
2020-03-03HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-03-02HouseWith amendment, do pass
2020-02-27HouseTo House Education
2020-02-27HouseTo Education
2020-02-27HouseIntroduced in House
2020-02-26SenateOrdered to House
2020-02-26SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 334)
2020-02-26SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 334)
2020-02-26SenateRead 3rd time
2020-02-26SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-02-25SenateFloor amendments adopted (Voice vote)
2020-02-25SenateRead 2nd time
2020-02-25SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-02-24SenateRead 1st time
2020-02-24SenateOn 1st reading
2020-02-21SenateReported do pass
2020-02-21SenateOriginating in Senate Education

Subjects


West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=842&year=2020&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=sb842%20org.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=842
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=sb842%20ENG.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=842
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=sb842%20ENR.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=842
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/senate/02-26-0334.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00541.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00542.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00543.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/senate/03-05-0473.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00697.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00698.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback