WV SB837 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Providing exemptions from ad valorem taxes for certain types of personal property
Title
Providing exemptions from ad valorem taxes for certain types of personal property
Sponsors
Sen. Craig Blair [R] | Sen. Eric Tarr [R] | Sen. Michael Maroney [R] | Sen. Rollan Roberts [R] |
Sen. Chandler Swope [R] | Sen. Tom Takubo [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 244) (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | To House Finance |
2020-02-25 | House | To Finance |
2020-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 244) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Originating in Senate Finance |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 15 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 15A | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 17 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 17 | 4b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 5A | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 5A | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 5A | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 5A | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 5A | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 5A | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 5A | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 5A | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 5A | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |