WV SB820 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing DHHR transfer comprehensive community mental health centers and intellectual disability facilities to regional centers and facilities
Title
Authorizing DHHR transfer comprehensive community mental health centers and intellectual disability facilities to regional centers and facilities
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Takubo [R] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 326) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | To House Finance |
2020-03-02 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2020-02-27 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2020-02-27 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Finance |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 326) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2020-02-17 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-17 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |