WV SB81 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Effective Date
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create the West Virginia Official Prescription Program to reduce prescription drug fraud
Title
Creating WV Official Prescription Program Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Effective Date | |
2010-04-22 | Chapter 147, Acts, Regular Session, 2010 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/22/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-22 | Approved by Governor 3/22/10 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/22/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/19/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-19 | To Governor 3/19/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-19 | To Governor 3/19/10 | |
2010-03-12 | House received Senate message | |
2010-03-11 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-11 | Communicated to House | |
2010-03-11 | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 2) | |
2010-03-10 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-10 | Passed House (Roll No. 230) | |
2010-03-10 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-10 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-09 | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-09 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-08 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-08 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-03-05 | 2nd reference dispensed | |
2010-03-05 | Do pass | |
2010-03-04 | To House Health and Human Resources | |
2010-03-04 | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced in House | |
2010-03-03 | Ordered to House | |
2010-03-03 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) | |
2010-03-03 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-03 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-03-02 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-02 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-03-01 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-01 | On 1st reading | |
2010-03-01 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-03-01 | Reported do pass | |
2010-02-17 | To Judiciary | |
2010-02-17 | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary | |
2010-01-13 | To Health and Human Resources | |
2010-01-13 | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary | |
2010-01-13 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-01-13 | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary | |
2010-01-13 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 5W | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5W | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5W | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5W | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5W | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5W | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5W | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5W | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=81&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |