WV SB800 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing electric utilities construct and operate project within electric utility distribution system
Title
Authorizing electric utilities construct and operate project within electric utility distribution system
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 262) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-02-26 | House | To Judiciary |
2020-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 262) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Motion withdrawn |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Motion to refer to Rules |
2020-02-25 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-02-17 | Senate | To Economic Development |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-17 | Senate | To Economic Development |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |