WV SB793 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 328, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 328, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to B&O taxes imposed on certain coal-fired electric generating units
Title
Relating to business and occupation taxes imposed on certain coal-fired electric generating units
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Smith [R] | Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 586) (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 585) (Y: 78 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 261) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 261) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 585) (Y: 78 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 261) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 261) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 328, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/18/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/18/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/18/20 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-05 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 586) |
2020-03-05 | House | House reconsidered its action |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 585) |
2020-03-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-05 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-03 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-03-03 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-02 | House | Do pass |
2020-02-26 | House | To House Finance |
2020-02-26 | House | To Finance |
2020-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 261) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 261) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2020-02-14 | Senate | To Finance |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-14 | Senate | To Finance |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 13 | 2q | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 13 | 2r | New Code | See Bill Text |