WV SB789 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 50, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 50, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing obsolete sections of WV Code relating to Legislature
Title
Repealing obsolete sections of WV Code relating to Legislature
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 430) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 217) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 216) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 217) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 216) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 50, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/13/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-13 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/20 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-02-29 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-02-29 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-29 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 430) |
2020-02-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-29 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-28 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-27 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-27 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-26 | House | Do pass |
2020-02-21 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-02-21 | House | To Judiciary |
2020-02-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 217) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 216) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-02-14 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-14 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
4 | 2B | 1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
4 | 3 | 3b | Repealed Code | Citation Text |