WV SB782 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - To House Health and Human Resources
Pending: House Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - To House Health and Human Resources
Pending: House Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to fees assessed by Health Care Authority on certain hospitals
Title
Relating to fees assessed by Health Care Authority on certain hospitals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 241) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2020-02-25 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2020-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 241) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-02-14 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-14 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 29B | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |