WV SB774 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-05 - Recommitted to Judiciary on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-05 - Recommitted to Judiciary on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to outline the duties and responsibilities of trail system operators, bicyclists, and passengers on aerial passenger tramways related to commercial bicycling activities in the State of West Virginia.
Title
Mountain Bike Responsibility Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 263) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | Recommitted to Judiciary on 3rd reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-05 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-04 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-03-04 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-03-01 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-29 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2024-02-27 | House | To House Economic Development and Tourism |
2024-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Title amendment adopted |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 263) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Amended on 3rd reading (Voice vote) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/24/2024 |
2024-02-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-23 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-02-22 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary |
2024-02-13 | Senate | To Outdoor Recreation |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-13 | Senate | To Outdoor Recreation then Judiciary |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 19 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 19 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 19 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 19 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 19 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 19 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 19 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 19 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |