WV SB765 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 88, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 88, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Modifying "Habitual Offender" statute
Title
Modifying "Habitual Offender" statute
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Weld [R] | Sen. Mike Woelfel [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 592) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 604) (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 603) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 321) (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 321) (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 604) (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 603) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 321) (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 321) (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 88, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/18/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/18/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/18/20 |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Effective ninety days from passage |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 592) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 604) |
2020-03-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-05 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 603) |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-05 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-04 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-03-04 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-03 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2020-02-27 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-02-27 | House | To Judiciary |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 321) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 321) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Judiciary on 2nd reading |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Without recommendation, but first rereferred to Judiciary |
2020-02-13 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-13 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 11 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 11 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |