WV SB760 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 173, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 173, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing state college or university apply to HEPC for designation as administratively or financially exempt school
Title
Allowing state college or university apply to HEPC for designation as administratively exempt school
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 582) (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 259) (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 259) (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 173, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/18/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/18/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/18/20 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-05 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 582) |
2020-03-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-05 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-04 | House | Amendment withdrawn (Voice vote) |
2020-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-03 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-03-03 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-02 | House | Do pass |
2020-02-26 | House | To House Education |
2020-02-26 | House | To Education |
2020-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 259) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/21/20 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2020-02-12 | Senate | To Education |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-12 | Senate | To Education |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18B | 1 | 1f | New Code | See Bill Text |
18B | 1 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 19 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 1B | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 1B | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 1D | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |