WV SB739 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 347, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 347, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing PSC protect consumers of distressed and failing water and wastewater utilities
Title
Authorizing PSC protect consumers of distressed and failing water and wastewater utilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 590) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 532) (Y: 76 N: 14 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 531) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 314) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 532) (Y: 76 N: 14 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 531) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 314) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 347, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-19 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/20 |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 590) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 532) |
2020-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-04 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 531) |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-03 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-03-03 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-02 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2020-02-27 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-02-27 | House | To Judiciary |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 314) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/24/20 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2020-02-10 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-10 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 13 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 13A | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
24 | 2 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
24 | 2 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
24 | 2 | 4a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
24 | 2H | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
24 | 2H | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
24 | 2H | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
24 | 2H | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
24 | 2H | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
24 | 2H | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
24 | 2H | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
24 | 2H | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
24 | 2H | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 15A | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 12 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 16 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 19 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 20 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |