WV SB734 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 313, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 313, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifying powers and duties of DOH in acquiring property for state road purposes
Title
Clarifying powers and duties of DOH in acquiring property for state road purposes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 385) (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 237) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 237) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 313, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/10/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/10/20 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-02-27 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-02-27 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 385) |
2020-02-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-27 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-26 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-25 | House | Reference dispensed |
2020-02-25 | House | Immediate consideration |
2020-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 237) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-02-07 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-07 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4651 (Similar To) 2020-03-07 - On 1st reading, House Calendar
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 2A | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |